OR HB4049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes eligibility for renewable energy certificates for facilities that generate electricity from direct combustion of municipal solid waste and became operational before January 1, 1995, if such facilities register with Western Renewable Energy Generation Information System at any time. Limits eligibility to certain amount of electricity generated, per calendar year, from the combustion of biogenic material.
Title
Relating to direct combustion of municipal solid waste.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-17 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |