OR HB4090 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Land Conservation and Development Commission to approve plans for urban growth boundary expansion to accommodate affordable housing in Pendleton. Sunsets affordable housing pilot program on January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to expansion of urban growth boundaries to accommodate affordable housing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Post, Wallan. |
2020-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |