OR HB4125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act tells LPRO to work with a vendor to write a draft report about the results of two previous bills and send a final report to the LA before the start of the next session. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). [Digest: The Act tells LPRO to study the results of SB 242 (2011). (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7).] Directs the Legislative Policy and Research Director to conduct a procurement and enter into a contract with a qualified vendor to conduct a study on the impact of Senate Bill 242 (2011) and Senate Bill 270 (2013) on higher education in this state. Specifies the data to be identified in the study and requires the [director] vendor to analyze specified potential alternative governing models for public universities in this state. [Authorizes the director to enter into contracts with public or private entities for purposes of the study.] Requires the director to submit a final report to the relevant interim committees of the Legislative Assembly by [September 15, 2025.] November 30, 2024. [Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a study on governing structures of public universities; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Farrah Chaichi [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Hoa Nguyen [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Nathan Sosa [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |