OR HB4150 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Willamette Falls Locks Authority as public corporation. Prescribes duties of authority. Modifies duties of Willamette Falls Locks Commission. Sunsets commission on June 30, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Willamette Falls Locks Authority; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Greenlick, Smith DB. |
2020-02-19 | House | Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Carried over to February 19, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |