OR HB4158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act would give money to two state agencies to support some types of child care providers in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). [Digest: The Act would give money to a state agency to help develop or improve child care in the state. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.2).] [Establishes the Home and Small Center Child Care Fund.] [Directs the Oregon Business Development Department to administer a grant program to provide financial assistance to child care facilities that serve a maximum of 75 children for the purpose of establishing or expanding child care infrastructure.] [Appropriates moneys to the department for deposit in the fund to carry out the program.] Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Business Development Department for deposit in the Child Care Infrastructure Fund to provide financial assistance to certain child care providers or organizations that support those child care providers. Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Department of Early Learning and Care to provide technical support to child care providers or organizations that receive financial assistance under the Act. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to child care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Hoa Nguyen [D] | Rep. Daniel Nguyen [D] | Rep. Thuy Tran [D] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Jules Walters [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |