OR HB4201 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 1, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 1, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Joint Committee on Transparent Policing and Use of Force Reform. Requires law enforcement agency to notify Attorney General when police officer uses physical force resulting in death or qualifying physical injury. Requires Attorney General to appoint special investigator to lead investigation upon receipt of notification. Directs Attorney General to prosecute violations of law related to use of physical force. Directs Attorney General to release reports from investigation if criminal proceedings are not initiated.] Establishes Joint Committee on Transparent Policing and Use of Force Reform. Directs committee to examine policies related to use of force and transparency in policing and recommend legislation to committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before December 31, 2020. Sunsets committee on December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the use of force by police officers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Chapter 1, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Prozanski, Taylor, Thatcher. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Heard, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-06-26 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem. |
2020-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-06-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |