OR HB4207 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 7, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 7, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to establish public statewide online database of suspensions and revocations of certifications of police officers. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to establish statewide database of police officer discipline records. Directs department to publish online information about disciplinary proceedings against police officers.] Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to establish public statewide online database of suspensions and revocations of certifications of police officers. Directs department to submit annual report to appropriate committee of Legislative Assembly on complaints against police officers] database. Requires law enforcement agency, before extending offer of employment to police officer applicant, to request and review personnel records of applicant from law enforcement agencies that previously employed applicant. Requires law enforcement agencies to maintain and share personnel records. Limits liability of agency that complies with requirements. Requires department to deny application for training or deny, suspend or revoke certification of police officer based upon certain findings. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to records of discipline of police officers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Chapter 7, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Prozanski, Taylor, Thatcher. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Boquist, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote nay. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-06-26 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lawrence Spence. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Nearman, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem. |
2020-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-06-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |