OR SB1025 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date, March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date, March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to radon in buildings; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to radon in buildings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date, March 18, 2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 83, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | President signed. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Gilman; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Accountability. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Atkinson, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Nelson, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-11 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Consumer Protection and Public Affairs. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |