OR SB145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes liability of candidate's treasurer for default or violation that occurs in performance of certain duties.
Title
Relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 758, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 5--Esquivel, Krieger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-05-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 2--Johnson, Starr. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |