OR SB1601 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, July 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, July 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Upon passage, allows Statewide Transportation Improvement Fund moneys to be used to maintain existing public transportation services. Upon passage, allows Statewide Transportation Improvement Fund moneys to be used to maintain existing public transportation services. Merges Elderly and Disabled Transportation Fund with Statewide Transportation Improvement Fund. Repeals provisions related to Elderly and Disabled Transportation Fund and transfers moneys in Elderly and Disabled Transportation Fund to Statewide Transportation Improvement Fund. Specifies that moneys in Statewide Transportation Improvement Fund may not be used to supplant local and regional agency moneys directed to public transportation service providers. Allows use of moneys in fund to support program administration, fund projects of statewide significance and manage operation of public transportation services. Dedicates portion of formula distributions in fund to transit services for older adults and individuals with disabilities. Provides each qualified entity annual target amount and directs Oregon Transportation Commission to adjust target amount depending on rate of growth in fund. Becomes operative July 1, 2023. Imposes moratorium on issuing citations for certain traffic offenses beginning on March 1, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020. Becomes operative on passage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to transportation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] |
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date, July 7, 2020. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Chapter 15, 2020 Laws. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |