OR SB247 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds containers that contain hard seltzer and containers that contain kombucha to types of beverage containers covered by provisions of Bottle Bill. Adds containers that contain hard seltzer and containers that contain kombucha to types of beverage containers covered by provisions of Bottle Bill. Requires payment of refund value of 10 cents for hard seltzer and kombucha containers on and after effective date of Act and until January 1, 2021, regardless of refund value indicated on beverage container. Allows sale of hard seltzer and kombucha containers that do not indicate proper refund value on and after effective date of Act and until January 1, 2021. Modifies applicability of civil penalty provisions to distributors and importers for violation of provisions for establishing distributor cooperatives. Requires persons responsible for operation of beverage container redemption centers to annually register with Oregon Liquor Control Commission and pay registration fee. Exempts operation of certain redemption centers from registration fee. Requires fees collected by commission to be deposited in Bottle Bill Fund. Establishes Bottle Bill Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to pay costs of commission in carrying out commission's duties under Bottle Bill provisions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to beverage containers; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2019-06-21SenateChapter 366, 2019 Laws.
2019-06-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-06SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-05SenateHass declared potential conflict of interest.
2019-06-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward.
2019-05-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Findley, Hernandez, Meek, Post, Smith Warner, Witt; Excused, 3--Barreto, Boshart Davis, McKeown.
2019-05-29HouseCarried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-28HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-05-21HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2019-04-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-23SenateHass declared potential conflict of interest.
2019-04-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Winters.
2019-04-22SenateCarried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent.
2019-04-18SenateCarried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent.
2019-04-17SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB247
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB247/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28854
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=461299
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29605
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=470809
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472058

Bill Comments

feedback