OR SB370 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes public safety assessment on covered entities. Imposes public safety assessment on covered entities. Defines "covered entity." Establishes Public Safety Assessment Fund. Requires certain covered entities to submit copy of return or form that covered entity must submit to obtain exemption from federal taxation if covered entity pays officer or employee more than $240,000. Applies to calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to regulation of certain business entities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB370 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB370/Introduced |