OR SB380 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits county from bringing claim or action against person if claim or action is based on statement in trust deed that nominee or agent of lender is grantee or beneficiary, based on county's recording or indexing instrument that states that nominee or agent of lender is grantee or beneficiary or based on person's having obtained or transferred interest in trust deed by means of instrument that was executed or delivered to person but was not recorded in county's deeds and mortgages records or in county's County Clerk Lien Record. Prohibits county clerk from charging or collecting fee for instrument that transfers interest in trust deed and that was executed and delivered to person but was not presented for recording. Applies to claims that arise before, on or after January 1, 2018, but does not apply to actions that commenced before January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to trust deeds; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |