OR SB396 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes alternative procedure for use by owner, operator or employee of fuel dispensary to obtain removal of vehicle preventing or hindering access to fuel dispensing equipment.
Title
Relating to the towing of vehicles from fuel dispensaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 330, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem. |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Burdick, Olsen, President Courtney, Taylor, Winters. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |