OR SB429 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs state agencies to deposit moneys that agencies receive through imposition of fees, fines or civil penalties into General Fund and not into other funds account continuously appropriated to agency.
Title
Relating to state finance; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |