OR SB497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lowers high school grade point average required to participate in Oregon Promise program from 2.5 to 2.0. Permits recipient of program grant to be enrolled in courses for less than half-time if recipient can demonstrate that recipient has paid employment that averages 30 or more hours per week.].
Title
Relating to Oregon Promise eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |