OR SB551 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Capital Construction Budget Process.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, August 1, 2013. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 716, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Berger, Cameron, Conger, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |