OR SB5529 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Human Services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Effective date, July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Chapter 675, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates,Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |