OR SB600 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Department of State Lands.
Title
Relating to the Department of State Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 713, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-28 | President signed. | |
2011-06-27 | Repassed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. House adopted Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-24 | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference Committee Report read in House. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 06-06 and B-Engrossed bill be further amended and repassed. | |
2011-06-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-20 | Representatives Boone, Jenson appointed House conferees. | |
2011-06-17 | Senators Dingfelder, Olsen, Prozanski appointed Senate conferees. | |
2011-06-17 | Motion to refuse to concur in House amendments carried. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Kruse. | |
2011-06-14 | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Bailey, Buckley, Cannon, Dembrow, Holvey, Matthews, Nathanson, Read, Smith J., Tomei. | |
2011-06-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-10 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-09 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-06 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-28 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-27 | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George. | |
2011-04-26 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-25 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-19 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |