OR SB783 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes continuing education requirements for residential construction contractors.
Title
Relating to construction contractor continuing education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, August 1, 2013. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 718, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Esquivel, McKeown, Witt. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Baertschiger, Knopp, Olsen declared potential conflict of interest. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |