OR SB845 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Governor and Director of the Department of Land Conservation and Development to exempt certain land use decisions from appeal by contract with member of traded sector industry that agrees to acquire and develop large-site industrial use employing at least 500 full-time employees.
Title
Relating to economic development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Starr [R] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |