OR SCR30 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honors 555th "Triple Nickles" Parachute Infantry Battalion for pioneering achievements and service to their country and this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring 555th "Triple Nickles" Parachute Infantry Battalion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2017-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-20HouseRead. Carried by Bynum. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2017-06-19HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2017-06-14HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-06-06HouseReferred to Rules.
2017-06-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-06-01SenateFinal reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
2017-06-01SenateMade a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent.
2017-05-30SenateTaken from 05-30 Calendar and placed on 06-01 Calendar on voice vote.
2017-05-26SenateCarried over to 05-30 by unanimous consent.
2017-05-25SenateSecond reading.
2017-05-25SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2017-05-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Rules.
2017-05-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback