OR SJR11 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to make assessed value of property equal to real market value after certain exception events.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to making assessed value of property equal to real market value after certain exception events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Rules. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |