OR SJR50 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting that Superintendent of Public Instruction encourage Chinese language study in Oregon schools.
Title
Requesting that Superintendent of Public Instruction encourage Chinese language study in Oregon schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | President signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Read. Carried by Richardson. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Education. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-11 | Final reading. Carried by Edwards. Adopted. Ayes, 29; absent, 1--Boquist. | |
2010-02-10 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Education and General Government. | |
2010-02-04 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |