PA HB1025 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-16)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, further defining "occupational disease."
Title
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, further defining "occupational disease."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-19 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY | |
2007-11-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-23 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-10-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-16 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-16 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-19 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-18 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1025 |