PA HB1030 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the City of Oil City, Venango County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bidding process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the First Ward of the City of Meadville, Crawford County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the City of Oil City, Venango County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bidding process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the First Ward of the City of Meadville, Crawford County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - HB 1030 PN 3193, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - HB 1030 PN 3193, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1030 PN 2434, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - House - HB 1030 PN 1187, 2009 A2573, ROAE (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - HB 1030 PN 3193, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1030 PN 2434, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - House - HB 1030 PN 1187, 2009 A2573, ROAE (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Act No. 20 | |
2010-04-29 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Signed in House | |
2010-04-20 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-04-20 | Reported as committed | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-02-09 | In the House | |
2010-02-09 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-08 | Amended on third consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-07-15 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-13 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-07-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-17 | First consideration | |
2009-06-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |