PA HB1033 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Summary
An Act designating September 11 of each year as "Pennsylvania Emergency Responders' Day."
Title
An Act designating September 11 of each year as "Pennsylvania Emergency Responders' Day."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-19 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-11-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-31 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-31 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-24 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-17 | First consideration | |
2007-10-17 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-05 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1033 |