PA HB1051 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child protective services, further providing for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1051 PN 1457, FP (Y: 168 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1051 PN 1214, 2019 A769, PETRARCA (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2019-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (168-22)
2019-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-15HouseReported as committed
2019-04-05HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1051
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1051&pn=1214
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1051&pn=1457
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=190
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=202
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=333

Bill Comments

feedback