PA HB1055 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-10 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the extension of certain permits and approvals affecting the physical development of real property located in municipalities.
Title
Providing for the extension of certain permits and approvals affecting the physical development of real property located in municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-08 - House - HB 1055 PN 2400, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - House - HB 1055 PN 2346, 2009 A2423, M. O'BRIEN (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - House - HB 1055 PN 2346, 2009 A2423, M. O'BRIEN (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-07-08 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-07-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-07 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-30 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-04 | Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS | |
2009-06-04 | Re-reported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS | |
2009-04-23 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-23 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-22 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-22 | First consideration | |
2009-04-22 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |