PA HB1055 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1055 PN 1407, FP (Y: 103 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1055 PN 1407, MOT RECON, CUTLER (Y: 109 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1055 PN 1407, FP (Y: 100 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2019-09-24SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-24HouseFinal passage (103-98)
2019-09-24HouseVote on final passage reconsidered
2019-04-30HouseThird consideration and defeated on final passage (100-97)
2019-04-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-29HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as committed
2019-04-15HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1055
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1055&pn=1407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=298
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=669
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=670

Bill Comments

feedback