PA HB1062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of July 16, 1941 (P.L.386, No.149), entitled "An act providing for the establishment, construction, operation and maintenance of a mountain ridge road or parkway in the Pocono Mountains through, bordering or accessible to the counties of Monroe, Northampton, Carbon, Luzerne, Lackawanna, Wayne and Pike, to be known as the "Pocono Mountain Memorial Parkway"; providing for the creation of the Pennsylvania Parkway Commission, and conferring powers, and imposing duties on said commission; authorizing the issuance of parkway revenue bonds of the Commonwealth, payable solely from tolls, to pay the cost of such parkway; providing that no debt of the Commonwealth shall be incurred in the exercise of any of the powers granted by this act; providing for the collection of tolls for the payment of such bonds and for the cost of maintenance, operation and repair of the parkway; making such bonds exempt from taxation; constituting such bonds legal investments in certain instances; prescribing conditions upon which such parkway shall become free; providing for condemnation; granting certain powers and authority to municipal subdivisions and other agencies of the Commonwealth to cooperate with the commission; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Highways and authorizing the issuance of parkway revenue refunding bonds."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of July 16, 1941 (P.L.386, No.149), entitled "An act providing for the establishment, construction, operation and maintenance of a mountain ridge road or parkway in the Pocono Mountains through, bordering or accessible to the counties of Monroe, Northampton, Carbon, Luzerne, Lackawanna, Wayne and Pike, to be known as the "Pocono Mountain Memorial Parkway"; providing for the creation of the Pennsylvania Parkway Commission, and conferring powers, and imposing duties on said commission; authorizing the issuance of parkway revenue bonds of the Commonwealth, payable solely from tolls, to pay the cost of such parkway; providing that no debt of the Commonwealth shall be incurred in the exercise of any of the powers granted by this act; providing for the collection of tolls for the payment of such bonds and for the cost of maintenance, operation and repair of the parkway; making such bonds exempt from taxation; constituting such bonds legal investments in certain instances; prescribing conditions upon which such parkway shall become free; providing for condemnation; granting certain powers and authority to municipal subdivisions and other agencies of the Commonwealth to cooperate with the commission; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Highways and authorizing the issuance of parkway revenue refunding bonds."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1062 PN 1224, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-05-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as committed
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback