PA HB1097 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for moment of silence on September 11 anniversary.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for moment of silence on September 11 anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 1288, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00496 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 1288, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00496 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |