PA HB1106 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, further providing for definitions, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1106 PN 1931, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A01297 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1106 PN 1931, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A01297 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-1) |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |