PA HB117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for auditor qualifications for the Department of the Auditor General, for new department employees, for current department employees, for employee certification, for forensic audits, for fraud audits and for committee standards.
Title
Providing for auditor qualifications for the Department of the Auditor General, for new department employees, for current department employees, for employee certification, for forensic audits, for fraud audits and for committee standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Craig Staats [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] |
Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] |
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 117 PN 85, 2021 A1151 (Y: 115 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-09-14 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to FINANCE |