PA HB1189 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-20)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-30 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Status: Introduced on May 4 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-30 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Summary
An Act establishing and providing for the administration of the Commonwealth Officer Program and the Commonwealth Officer Fund; providing for duties of the Office of Attorney General; lapsing certain funds; and making an appropriation.
Title
An Act establishing and providing for the administration of the Commonwealth Officer Program and the Commonwealth Officer Fund; providing for duties of the Office of Attorney General; lapsing certain funds; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-30 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented | |
2007-10-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-17 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-16 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-16 | First consideration | |
2007-10-16 | Reported as amended | |
2007-05-04 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1189 |