PA HB1196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1610, No.181), known as the Rabies Prevention and Control in Domestic Animals and Wildlife Act, further providing for vaccination certification.
Title
Further providing for vaccination certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |