PA HB1204 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for number and kinds of licenses allowed same licensee and for interlocking business prohibited; and, in distilleries, wineries, bonded warehouses, bailees for hire and transporters for hire, further providing for limited wineries.
Title
In licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for number and kinds of licenses allowed same licensee and for interlocking business prohibited; and, in distilleries, wineries, bonded warehouses, bailees for hire and transporters for hire, further providing for limited wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1204 PN 1579, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1204 PN 1579, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2015-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2015-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |