PA HB1246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, in municipal financial distress, further providing for designation and for performance of coordinator; and, in receivership in municipalities, further providing for receiver.
Title
In municipal financial distress, further providing for designation and for performance of coordinator; and, in receivership in municipalities, further providing for receiver.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1246 PN 1450, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1246 PN 1450, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2019-09-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |