PA HB1279 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a section of Christopher Columbus Boulevard between Oregon Avenue and Washington Avenue in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the William J. Guarnere and Edward "Babe" Heffron Memorial Boulevard; designating a portion of US Route 222 in Lancaster County as the Senator Noah W. Wenger Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1029 over the Tunkhannock Creek, Nicholson Township, Wyoming County, as the Jody Allen Cron Memorial Bridge; designating Exit 113, State Ramp 8001, from Interstate 79 onto State Route 208, in Springfield Township, Mercer County, as the Lieutenant Colonel Michael E. McLaughlin Veterans Ramp; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 88 over Muddy Creek, Cumberland Township, Greene County, as the Army Specialist Richard W. Kowalewski, Jr., Memorial Bridge; and making a related repeal.
Title
Designating a section of Christopher Columbus Boulevard between Oregon Avenue and Washington Avenue in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the William J. Guarnere and Edward "Babe" Heffron Memorial Boulevard; designating a portion of US Route 222 in Lancaster County as the Senator Noah W. Wenger Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1029 over the Tunkhannock Creek, Nicholson Township, Wyoming County, as the Jody Allen Cron Memorial Bridge; designating Exit 113, State Ramp 8001, from Interstate 79 onto State Route 208, in Springfield Township, Mercer County, as the Lieutenant Colonel Michael E. McLaughlin Veterans Ramp; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 88 over Muddy Creek, Cumberland Township, Greene County, as the Army Specialist Richard W. Kowalewski, Jr., Memorial Bridge; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 2613, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1279 PN 2613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 1967, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 1710, 2015 A2243, KELLER, W. (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 2613, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1279 PN 2613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 1967, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1279 PN 1710, 2015 A2243, KELLER, W. (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-20 | House | Act No. 87 |
2015-12-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2015-12-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-12-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-12-08 | House | In the House |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2015-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |