PA HB128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-22)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 128 PN 563, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 128 PN 359, 2019 A84, B. MILLER (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00046 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2019-02-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-1)
2019-02-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-05HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-05HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=128
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0128&pn=0122
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0128&pn=0359
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0128&pn=0563
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=13
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=14
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=39
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=53
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=44

Bill Comments

feedback