PA HB131 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 3, 1947 (P.L.1242, No.507), entitled "An act relating to police and firemen's pension funds in cities of the second class A, and directing such cities to appropriate certain moneys thereto, and requiring reports and audits," further providing for credit for military service.
Title
Amending the act of July 3, 1947 (P.L.1242, No.507), entitled "An act relating to police and firemen's pension funds in cities of the second class A, and directing such cities to appropriate certain moneys thereto, and requiring reports and audits," further providing for credit for military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - House - HB 131 PN 128, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |