PA HB1334 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1981 (P.L.214, No.67), known as the Bingo Law, further providing for definitions, for rules for licensing and operation and for penalties.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for rules for licensing and operation and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1334 PN 3342, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06994 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06993 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1334 PN 3342, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06994 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06993 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-2) |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-13 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |