PA HB1342 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on June 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-29 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on June 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-29 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 4, 2008 (P.L.518, No.42), known as the Cigarette Fire Safety and Firefighter Protection Act, further providing for standards for cigarette fire safety and for sale of existing inventory.
Title
Further providing for standards for cigarette fire safety and for sale of existing inventory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - HB 1342 PN 1794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - House - HB 1342 PN 1794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - House - HB 1342 PN 1794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | Act No. 9 | |
2009-06-29 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-06-24 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-06-24 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Signed in House | |
2009-06-22 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-15 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2009-06-01 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-12 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-07 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-07 | First consideration | |
2009-05-07 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |