PA HB1362 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-15 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-15 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in home rule and optional plan government, further providing for procedure for amendment of charter or optional plan.
Title
In home rule and optional plan government, further providing for procedure for amendment of charter or optional plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Kampf [R] | Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1362 PN 1691, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-09-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-0) |
2017-07-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-09 | House | Second consideration |
2017-07-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |