PA HB139 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for distress in school districts of the first class; providing for State reimbursement for mobile classroom facilities; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for distress in school districts of the first class; providing for State reimbursement for mobile classroom facilities; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - House - HB 139 PN 2046, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2593, MCGEEHAN (Y: 78 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2592, MCGEEHAN (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2588, MCGEEHAN (Y: 29 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2593, MCGEEHAN (Y: 78 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2592, MCGEEHAN (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - HB 139 PN 77, 2011 A2588, MCGEEHAN (Y: 29 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2011-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |