PA HB1420 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-28 - Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-28 - Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for the definitions of "case," "distributor" and "importing distributor"; providing for the definitions of "holiday package," "out-of-State small manufacturer" and "small manufacturer"; providing for Manufacturer's Packaging Equipment Grant Fund; further providing for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages alternating brewers' licenses, for sales and minimum quantities, for distributors' and importing distributors' restrictions on sales, storage, etc., for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for interlocking business prohibited and for breweries; providing for manufacturer grant program and for product rotation; and further providing for exchange of certain licenses and for moneys paid into the State Stores Fund for use of the Commonwealth.
Title
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for the definitions of "case," "distributor" and "importing distributor"; providing for the definitions of "holiday package," "out-of-State small manufacturer" and "small manufacturer"; providing for Manufacturer's Packaging Equipment Grant Fund; further providing for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages alternating brewers' licenses, for sales and minimum quantities, for distributors' and importing distributors' restrictions on sales, storage, etc., for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for interlocking business prohibited and for breweries; providing for manufacturer grant program and for product rotation; and further providing for exchange of certain licenses and for moneys paid into the State Stores Fund for use of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-28 | Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2007-11-27 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-15 | First consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-26 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-20 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-20 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-18 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-14 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-14 | First consideration | |
2007-06-14 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-05 | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1420 |