PA HB1431 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating that portion of State Routes 54, 901 and 2023 in Northumberland County and Schuylkill County as the Honorable Robert E. Belfanti, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating Exit 18 of State Route 43, known as the Searights Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Staff Sgt. John P. Wanto Vietnam Veteran Exit; designating Exit 15 of State Route 43, known as the Old Pittsburgh Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Lance Corporal Russell W. Naugle Vietnam Veteran Exit; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2003 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, South Middleton Township, Cumberland County, as the Sgt. Adam C. Schoeller Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 18 in West Fallowfield Township, Crawford County, as the Staff Sergeant James Douglas Mowris Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 100 from the intersection of Main Street and Tilghman Street in Upper Macungie Township, Lehigh County, to the intersection of Claussville Road and Kernsville Road in Lowhill Township, Lehigh County, as the Captain Mark T. Resh Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 18 (College Avenue) over the Little Shenango River, Greenville Borough, Mercer County, as the Greenville Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating that portion of State Route 3078 and State Route 3090 in York County from the intersection with State Route 116 to the intersection with State Route 3042 as the Private First Class Donald R. Gise Memorial Road; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, known as Church View Road, Segment 0180, Offset 0000, over Beaver Creek, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the PFC/POW William G. Koontz Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 588 over Interstate 376, Chippewa Township, Beaver County, as the TFC Blake T. Coble Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating that portion of State Routes 54, 901 and 2023 in Northumberland County and Schuylkill County as the Honorable Robert E. Belfanti, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating Exit 18 of State Route 43, known as the Searights Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Staff Sgt. John P. Wanto Vietnam Veteran Exit; designating Exit 15 of State Route 43, known as the Old Pittsburgh Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Lance Corporal Russell W. Naugle Vietnam Veteran Exit; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2003 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, South Middleton Township, Cumberland County, as the Sgt. Adam C. Schoeller Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 18 in West Fallowfield Township, Crawford County, as the Staff Sergeant James Douglas Mowris Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 100 from the intersection of Main Street and Tilghman Street in Upper Macungie Township, Lehigh County, to the intersection of Claussville Road and Kernsville Road in Lowhill Township, Lehigh County, as the Captain Mark T. Resh Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 18 (College Avenue) over the Little Shenango River, Greenville Borough, Mercer County, as the Greenville Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating that portion of State Route 3078 and State Route 3090 in York County from the intersection with State Route 116 to the intersection with State Route 3042 as the Private First Class Donald R. Gise Memorial Road; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, known as Church View Road, Segment 0180, Offset 0000, over Beaver Creek, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the PFC/POW William G. Koontz Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 588 over Interstate 376, Chippewa Township, Beaver County, as the TFC Blake T. Coble Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2411, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A02386 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BARBIN (Y: 179 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2091, A2256, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-2256 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 1842, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01449 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2411, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A02386 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BARBIN (Y: 179 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2156, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1431 PN 2091, A2256, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-2256 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1431 PN 1842, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01449 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Senate | Act No. 73 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-09-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (194-0) |
2017-09-13 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2017-09-13 | House | Amended in House Committee on RULES |
2017-07-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-07-08 | House | In the House |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Amended on second consideration (49-1) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |