PA HB1441 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 6, 1951 (P.L.69, No.20), known as The Landlord and Tenant Act of 1951, providing for tenants' rights in cases of violence.
Title
Providing for tenants' rights in cases of violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-14 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |