PA HB1461 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and providing for criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information; in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Center for Rural Pennsylvania; in Office of State Inspector General, further providing for powers, purpose and duties and for criminal charges; in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of State; in Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for revenue estimates; providing for Joint Underwriting Association accountability; in powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, providing for Bureau of Occupational and Industrial Safety; providing for legislative agencies and the continuation of Pennsylvania Commission on Sentencing; and making editorial changes and related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and providing for criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information; in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Center for Rural Pennsylvania; in Office of State Inspector General, further providing for powers, purpose and duties and for criminal charges; in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of State; in Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for revenue estimates; providing for Joint Underwriting Association accountability; in powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, providing for Bureau of Occupational and Industrial Safety; providing for legislative agencies and the continuation of Pennsylvania Commission on Sentencing; and making editorial changes and related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1461 PN 2267, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1461 PN 2267, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1461 PN 2064, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1461 PN 1828, 2019 A1629, SNYDER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseAct No. 15
2019-06-28HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-28HouseSigned in House
2019-06-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (181-16)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-27HouseIn the House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (29-21)
2019-06-26SenateRe-reported as amended
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-06-14SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as committed
2019-05-14HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1461
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1461&pn=1828
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1461&pn=2064
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1461&pn=2267
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=375
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=654
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=716
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=244
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=632

Bill Comments

feedback