PA HB1479 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt or brewed beverages manufactured outside this Commonwealth, for brand registration and for revocation and suspension of licenses and fines.
Title
Further providing for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt or brewed beverages manufactured outside this Commonwealth, for brand registration and for revocation and suspension of licenses and fines.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Rep. John Payne [R] | Sen. John Sabatina [D] |
Rep. Chelsa Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-13 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-11 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-05-09 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |